TX HB1337 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to priority of payment for certain electrical service claims against the estates of certain decedents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to priority of payment for certain electrical service claims against the estates of certain decedents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-05HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-03-05HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback