TX HB1336 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding for state and county roads affected in areas of increased energy production.
Title
Relating to funding for state and county roads affected in areas of increased energy production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-03-11 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Roads
Highways
TRANSPORTATION INFRASTRUCTURE FUND
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
County Government--Roads
Highways
TRANSPORTATION INFRASTRUCTURE FUND
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1336 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01336I.htm |