TX HB1323 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-05HousePosting rule suspended
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HJR62 (Enabling for) 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SB628 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback