TX HB1319 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the time for rendering a final order in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the time for rendering a final order in certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Same As) 2021-05-28 - House appoints conferees-reported
HB576 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - No action taken in committee
HB576 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - No action taken in committee