TX HB1315 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duration of an appointment of a guardian ad litem or an attorney ad litem for a child in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the duration of an appointment of a guardian ad litem or an attorney ad litem for a child in the conservatorship of the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1667 (Y: 107 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#381 (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#381 (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1667 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | Record vote RV#381 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended 1-J.D. Johnson |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Lawyers
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Lawyers