TX HB13 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training, preparedness, and funding for school safety and emergencies in public schools.
Title
Relating to training, preparedness, and funding for school safety and emergencies in public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Amended RV#443 (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#443 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-04-25 | House | Amended 1-Zwiener |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 11-Morales Shaw |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 10-Zwiener and Talarico |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 9-Wilson, et al. |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 8-Bailes |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 7-C. Morales |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 6-Martinez Fischer |
2023-04-24 | House | Amendment withdrawn 5-Martinez Fischer |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 4-S. Thompson |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 3-Tinderholt |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 2-Lozano |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 1-K. King |
2023-04-24 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR170 (Enabling for) 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND CORPORATION, TEXAS
Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND CORPORATION, TEXAS
Safety
SCHOOL SAFETY CENTER, TEXAS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons