TX HJR170 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the state school safety fund to provide financial support for projects that enhance the safety of public schools in this state.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment creating the state school safety fund to provide financial support for projects that enhance the safety of public schools in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - Adopted RV#428 (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#428 |
2023-04-24 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB4406 (Enabled by) 2023-03-27 - Left pending in committee
HB13 (Enabled by) 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
HB13 (Enabled by) 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Legislature
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND CORPORATION, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Legislature
PERMANENT SCHOOL FUND CORPORATION, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control