TX HB1296 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information regarding postsecondary education and career opportunities and workforce needs in this state.
Title
Relating to information regarding postsecondary education and career opportunities and workforce needs in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - HB 1296Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-02 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Nonpublic Schools
Education--Nonpublic Schools--Vocational/Avocational
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS