TX HB1286 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adoption of rules by the University Interscholastic League.
Title
Relating to adoption of rules by the University Interscholastic League.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-23 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-20 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-19 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-19 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-16 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Amended | |
2011-05-13 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-10 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-13 | Referred to Education | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE