TX HB1285 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of State Highways 118 and 166 as the Davis Mountains Scenic Loop Highway and a historic highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of State Highways 118 and 166 as the Davis Mountains Scenic Loop Highway and a historic highway.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-13HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB633 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Reported engrossed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback