TX SB633 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of State Highways 118 and 166 as the Davis Mountains Scenic Loop Highway and a historic highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of State Highways 118 and 166 as the Davis Mountains Scenic Loop Highway and a historic highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1285
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-27HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-09SenateFiled
2021-02-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1285 (Same As) 2021-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB633
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00633I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00633S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00633E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00633H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00633F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00633I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00633I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00633E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00633H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00633F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB633&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021

Bill Comments

feedback