TX HB1274 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain transportation authorities to create a local government corporation.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain transportation authorities to create a local government corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2013-02-28 | House | Correction in referral |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1274 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01274I.htm |