TX HB1274 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the availability and reporting of certain information regarding applications under the Texas Economic Development Act to the public and the state.
Title
Relating to the availability and reporting of certain information regarding applications under the Texas Economic Development Act to the public and the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-13 | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--School Districts
INTERNET
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Education
Education--School Districts
INTERNET
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District