TX HB1264 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the concurrent jurisdiction of certain municipal courts in certain criminal cases punishable by fine only.
Title
Relating to the concurrent jurisdiction of certain municipal courts in certain criminal cases punishable by fine only.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#479 (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#479 (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-13 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-13 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |