TX HB1262 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education and training for peace officers on interacting with certain persons.
Title
Relating to education and training for peace officers on interacting with certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#258 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#258 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended 2-Schofield |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended 1-Bowers |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HOMELESS
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
CONTINUING EDUCATION
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HOMELESS
Law Enforcement
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS