TX HB1260 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on the feasibility of establishing a centralized homelessness crisis response data system.
Title
Relating to a study on the feasibility of establishing a centralized homelessness crisis response data system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HOMELESS, TEXAS INTERAGENCY COUNCIL FOR THE
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons
HOMELESS, TEXAS INTERAGENCY COUNCIL FOR THE
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Housing--Homeless Persons