TX HB1240 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a fire marshal and the authority of certain county employees to issue citations for certain violations; changing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a fire marshal and the authority of certain county employees to issue citations for certain violations; changing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1571 (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1571
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-06SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-05-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-26SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-23HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#417
2021-04-23HousePassed
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-06HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to County Affairs
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB658 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1240
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01240I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01240H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01240E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01240S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01240F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01240I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01240H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01240H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01240E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01240E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01240S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01240S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01240F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1240&RcdVtNo=417&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1240&RcdVtNo=1571&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback