TX SB658 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a fire marshal and the authority of certain county employees to issue citations for certain violations; changing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a fire marshal and the authority of certain county employees to issue citations for certain violations; changing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1240 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE MARSHAL
FIRE SAFETY & PREVENTION
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
FIRE MARSHAL
FIRE SAFETY & PREVENTION