TX HB1237 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adverse disproportionalities within the child protective services system.
Title
Relating to adverse disproportionalities within the child protective services system.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. John Bucy [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#860 (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#860 |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |