TX HB1237 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Internet access to checking account transactions of a public institution of higher education.
Title
Relating to Internet access to checking account transactions of a public institution of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1237 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01237I.htm |