TX HB1206 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to permissible uses of the instructional materials and technology allotment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to permissible uses of the instructional materials and technology allotment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-14SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB241 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback