TX HB1199 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale or assignment of tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Title
Relating to the sale or assignment of tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-04-20 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1199 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01199I.htm |