TX HB1199 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-16 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the enhancement of punishment in criminal cases.
Title
Relating to the enhancement of punishment in criminal cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-16 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-16 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-04 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |