TX HB1179 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certification requirements for certain property tax professionals.
Title
Relating to certification requirements for certain property tax professionals.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts