TX HB1151 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibiting the purchase of certain food items under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
Relating to prohibiting the purchase of certain food items under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | Filed |