TX HB1144 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
Summary
Relating to eligibility to serve as a poll watcher.
Title
Relating to eligibility to serve as a poll watcher.
Sponsors
Rep. Betty Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Elections | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time | |
2009-02-09 | Filed |