TX HB11 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Returned to committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to finance certain water-related projects.
Title
Relating to the appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund to finance certain water-related projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 3 by Dutton (Y: 86 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Martinez Fischer (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Martinez Fischer (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Returned to committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Point of order sustained |
2013-04-29 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2013-04-29 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-29 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2013-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-29 | House | Amendment to amendment tabled |
2013-04-29 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2013-04-29 | House | Amendment to amendment offered |
2013-04-29 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-29 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-04-29 | House | Postponed |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2013-04-26 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-18 | House | No action taken in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2013-03-11 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General
State Finances--Appropriations
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
Water--Development
Water--General