TX HB1090 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the calculation of interest on certain ad valorem tax refunds.
Title
Relating to the calculation of interest on certain ad valorem tax refunds.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Rep. Naomi Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Rep. Donald Margo [R] |
Rep. Rene Oliveira [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Rep. Mike Villarreal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-04 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-03 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |