TX HB1083 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of an identification card to certain honorably retired peace officers.
Title
Relating to the issuance of an identification card to certain honorably retired peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-25 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--General
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
Education--General
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS