TX HB1041 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to administrative and judicial review of certain Medicaid reimbursement disputes; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to administrative and judicial review of certain Medicaid reimbursement disputes; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID