TX HB101 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of radio frequency identification technology to transmit information regarding public school students.
Title
Relating to the use of radio frequency identification technology to transmit information regarding public school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Science & Technology
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT
Science & Technology