TX HB101 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a hotline to report suspected incidents of impaired driving or dangerous driving.
Title
Relating to the creation of a hotline to report suspected incidents of impaired driving or dangerous driving.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | |
2011-04-14 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-04-08 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-04-08 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
EMAIL & ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS
INTERNET
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB101 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00101I.htm |