TX HB1009 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a new category of law enforcement officer who shall be designated a school marshal, the training and appointment of certain employees of a school district or open-enrollment charter school as school marshals, and the rights, restrictions, limitations, and responsibilities of school marshals; authorizing the imposition of a fee.
Title
Relating to the creation of a new category of law enforcement officer who shall be designated a school marshal, the training and appointment of certain employees of a school district or open-enrollment charter school as school marshals, and the rights, restrictions, limitations, and responsibilities of school marshals; authorizing the imposition of a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - HB 1009Third Reading House (Y: 123 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-06 | House | Passed |
2013-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-04 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-04 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PROTECTION OF TEXAS CHILDREN ACT
Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER STANDARDS & EDUCATION, COMMN. ON
PROTECTION OF TEXAS CHILDREN ACT
Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Weapons