TX HB10 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to and benefits for mental health conditions and substance use disorders.
Title
Relating to access to and benefits for mental health conditions and substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#141 (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#139 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#141 (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#139 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-04 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse