TX HB1 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-07 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to avoiding the abolishment of certain agencies subject to the Texas Sunset Act on September 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to avoiding the abolishment of certain agencies subject to the Texas Sunset Act on September 1, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#6 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-08-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-07-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-07-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-07-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-07-25 | House | Passed |
2017-07-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-07-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-07-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-07-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-07-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-07-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
MARRIAGE & FAMILY THERAPISTS, TEXAS ST. BD. OF EXAMINERS OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills