TN SR0276 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National Window Film Day
Title
A RESOLUTION to recognize National Window Film Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Adopted, voice vote |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/16/24 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |