TN SR0252 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sarah Margaret Alexander Easter
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Sarah Margaret Alexander Easter of Kingston.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |