TN SR0155 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Kathleen Jessica Barroll
Title
Kathleen Jessica Barroll
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-03 | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-05-27 | Filed for intro. |