TN SR0126 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Senate Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dakota Tester
Title
Dakota Tester
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |