TN SR0109 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-21 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 8/22/2023
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-21 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 8/22/2023
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Women's History Month in Tennessee
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to the celebration of Women's History Month in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 8/22/2023 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SR0109&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SR0109.pdf |