TN SR0038 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Eddie George
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Eddie George on becoming the new head football coach at Tennessee State University.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |