TN SR0035 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by S. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Chontel Bridgeman, Read Across America Day at Homer Pittard Campus School
Title
Dr. Chontel Bridgeman, Read Across America Day at Homer Pittard Campus School
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Filed for intro. |