TN SJR9005 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 4 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the federal government's penalizing, or taxation of, citizens of this State through enforcement of restrictions relative to COVID-19 by supporting the challenging, condemning, and nullifying of such action.
Title
A RESOLUTION to address the federal government's penalizing, or taxation of, citizens of this State through enforcement of restrictions relative to COVID-19 by supporting the challenging, condemning, and nullifying of such action.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY RAGAN MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 69 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 64 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-22 | Senate | Returned by Governor without signature. |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-11-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment #1 |
2021-10-29 | House | Concurred as am., Ayes 64, Nays 17, PNV 3 |
2021-10-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA9023) |
2021-10-29 | House | H. subst. HJR 9005 for SJR 9005 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2021-10-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 10/29/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |