TN SJR8005 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Melinda Douthat Pruitt, 2020 Judy Thompson Phillips Lifetime Contribution to Education Award
Title
Dr. Melinda Douthat Pruitt, 2020 Judy Thompson Phillips Lifetime Contribution to Education Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-08-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-08-12 | House | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2020-08-11 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 8/12/20 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/11/2020 |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |