TN SJR7112 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Objected to on Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dr. Erika Stevens
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Dr. Erika Stevens on her selection as the Community College Teacher of the Year by the American Association of Teachers of Spanish and Portuguese.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-29 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-29 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 8/29/2023 |
2023-08-28 | House | Held on desk. |
2023-08-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 8/28/2023 |
2023-08-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-24 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-08-23 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 8/24/2023 |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/23/2023 |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |