TN SJR7101 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns sine die First Extraordinary Session of 113th General Assembly on August 22, 2023.
Title
A RESOLUTION to provide for the adjournment sine die of the First Extraordinary Session of the One Hundred Thirteenth General Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-28 | House | Held on desk. |
2023-08-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR7101&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR7101.pdf |