TN SJR1413 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
East Nashville Magnet School, Class AA state champions
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend the members and coaches of the East Nashville Magnet School Eagles boys' basketball team upon winning the TSSAA Division I, Class AA state championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/31/22 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |