TN SJR1356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Anna Shepherd
Title
Anna Shepherd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-16 | House | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-15 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 6/16/20 |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |