TN SJR1097 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Allie Elisabeth Lingerfelt, Mary Patton Chapter of the NSDAR Good Citizen Award
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Allie Elisabeth Lingerfelt upon her receipt of the Mary Patton Chapter of the National Society Daughters of the American Revolution Good Citizen Award.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-03-18 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |