TN SJR1092 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Tardive Dyskinesia (TD) Awareness Week," May 1-7, 2022
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate the week of May 1-7, 2022, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |